Satyanarayana, Satyendra (CPSO#: 76334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
199 Chesley Drive
Saint John NB  E2K 4S9
Phone: (506) 658-0029

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATYENDRA SATYANARAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATYANARAYANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015