Sauder, Daniel Nathan (CPSO#: 33207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Rollingmead Street
Princeton NJ  08540
United States
Phone: (908) 507-1770

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New Jersey
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL NATHAN SAUDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1982