Sauerbrei, Eric (CPSO#: 28818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department Of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Fax: (613) 548-2412
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department Of Radiology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Ontario Breast Screening Program
490 Discovery Avenue, Suite #5
Kingston ON  K7K 7E9
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Kingston MRI and KMI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Canada
Phone: (613) 384-1220
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Earl Sauerbrei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )

Business Address:
Kingston MRI and KMI
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-5488

Business Address:
Ontario Breast Screening Program
490 Discovery Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 4E2
Phone Number: (613) 384-4284

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Radiology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1S3
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, McCallum, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. S. Grahovac ( CPSO# 54394 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC SAUERBREI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUERBREI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1976