Saunders, Brian Paul (CPSO#: 87755)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College Hospital Med. School, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2017