Saunders, Christine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 88536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
900 Greenbank Rd
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone: (613) 825-8476
Fax: (613) 825-9045
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ELIZABETH SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2011