Saunders, Darren Dean (CPSO#: 55522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 Kilmorey Court
North Bay ON  P1C 1L9
Phone: (705) 476-2657
Fax: (705) 476-2437
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN DEAN SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 May 2008
Summary:

 On Monday, May 12, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
 Ontario found that Dr. Darren Dean Saunders committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
 engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
 to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1)	Dr. Saunders appear 
 before the panel to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.

2)	The 
 Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Saunders( certificate of 
 registration:
 
(a)	that Dr. Saunders continue treatment by his psychiatrist who will provide 
 quarterly reports to the College until his psychiatrist recommends that treatment is no longer 
 necessary.  If for any reason there is an inability for his psychiatrist to continue treating Dr. 
 Saunders, then another psychiatrist, acceptable to the College, may be substituted; and

(b)	that 
 Dr. Saunders identify a physician in the hospital in which Dr. Saunders practices who will agree 
 to monitor his behaviour for a period of thirty (30) months, report to the College every three 
 months and execute an undertaking acceptable to the College, a copy of which is attached as 
 Appendix (A( to the original Order.

 3)	The results of the proceeding to be included on the 
 register.

Therefore, the terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration in 
 the Province of Ontario issued in the name of Dr. Darren Dean Saunders are effective Monday, May 
 12, 2008 at 12:00 noon.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 12, 2008