Saunders, Louis John (CPSO#: 64186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Macedonian

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Community Health Centre
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-3574
Fax: (905) 573-4835
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louis Saunders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Saunders ( CPSO# 64186 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Community Health Centre
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-3574

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS JOHN SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1992