Saunders, Michael Gerrard (CPSO#: 65189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
723 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E3
Phone: (519) 745-2366
Fax: (519) 745-9035
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1370 Dundas st E
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Canada
Phone: (906) 306-9229
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saunders and Mandalfino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saunders ( CPSO# 65189 )
Dr. P. Mandalfino ( CPSO# 65176 )

Business Address:
723 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E3
Phone Number: (519) 745-2366

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERRARD SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993