Saunders, Richard Nigel (CPSO#: 84051)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cambridge, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2006 to 13 Apr 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 14 Apr 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006