Saunderson, Janet Louise (CPSO#: 53898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 465-7421
Fax: (416) 465-6588
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET LOUISE SAUNDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1987