Saunoris, Algimantas (CPSO#: 30573)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Lithuanian, Polish, Russian

Education:Vilnius State University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective April 15, 2011, Dr. Saunoris has resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.