Sauriol, Nathalie (CPSO#: 69941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Blue Mountains Community
Health Centre
78 King Street East
PO Box #70
Thornbury ON  N0H 2P0
Phone: (519) 599-2732
Fax: (519) 599-5895
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GBHS - Meaford Site
229 Nelson Street
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 538-1311
Fax: (519) 599-5895
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sauriol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sauriol ( CPSO# 69941 )

Business Address:
78 King Street East
Thornbury ON  N0H 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 599-2732

Business Address:
229 Nelson Street West
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE SAURIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAURIOL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998