Sauve, Michel (CPSO#: 55299)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2003