Sauve, Stephane Jean (CPSO#: 61381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 David Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1T6
Phone: (705) 670-0793
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Sauve Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sauve ( CPSO# 61381 )

Business Address:
235 David Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 670-0793

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANE JEAN SAUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990