Savage, Martha Harriet Billingsley (CPSO#: 67708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Feb 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Billingsley, Martha Harriet (used until: 21 May 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Mental Health Association
80 Waterloo Ave
Guelph ON  N1H 0A1
Phone: (519) 821-2060
Fax: (519) 821-6139
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Feb 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 1994 to 30 Apr 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Martha  Harriet  Billingsley Savage may practise medicine independently in
            psychiatry, only.