Savard, Patrick (CPSO#: 63353)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997