Savelli, Gordina Elizabeth (CPSO#: 32332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
730 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone: (905) 549-7326
Fax: (905) 549-9661
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordina Elizabeth Savelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Savelli ( CPSO# 32332 )

Business Address:
730 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 549-7326

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDINA ELIZABETH SAVELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVELLI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1981