Savic, Mile (CPSO#: 75873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Nov 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
150 Sidney Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone: (613) 966-7300
Fax: (613) 966-7320
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 25 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Apr 2015

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Savic’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Savic breached an undertaking given to the College in his prescribing practice and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including in ordering unnecessary diagnostic testing and in his billing practice. It is also alleged that Dr. Savic is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in the care of his patients, including in his prescribing and in ordering unnecessary diagnostic testing.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): August 14-17, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., February 19, 2015, by order of the Discipline, Committee of
            the  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Ontario,  the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of  registration held
            by Dr. Mile Savic:


                        i.    Dr.   Savic,   at  his  own  expense,  is  to  submit  to   a
                              comprehensive practice  assessment  of  his  practice,  by an
                              assessor  selected  by the College, immediately following the
                              completion of the individualized  Educational  Plan, which is
                              now  in  progress,  and which is expected to be completed  by
                              July 31, 2015;
                  
                        ii.   Dr. Savic shall abide  by  those  recommendations made by the
                              Assessor  which are determined by the  Inquiries,  Complaints
                              and Reports  Committee  to be reasonable.  Dr. Savic shall be
                              permitted  to make written  submissions  on  his  own  behalf
                              within 30 days of receipt of the assessment to the Inquiries,
                              Complaints and  Reports Committee.  The Inquiries, Complaints
                              and Reports Committee shall receive and review the assessor's
                              recommendations and  Dr. Savic's written submissions and make
                              a determination regarding whether or not the recommendations,
                              or  any  of them, are reasonable  and  if  so,  whether  they
                              constitute  terms,  conditions  or limitations on Dr. Savic's
                              practice, in which case they will  be  included on the public
                              register.
                  
                        iii.  Dr.  Savic  shall, at his own expense, successfully  complete
                              College-facilitated  instruction  in Ethics no later than one
                              (1) year from the date of this Order;
                  
                        iv.   Dr.  Savic  shall  not  delegate  to  any  other  person  any
                              Controlled  Act  as  that term is defined  in  the  Regulated
                              Health Professions Act, 1991;
                  
                        v.    Dr. Savic shall not conduct  or  interpret Echocardiograms or
                              exercise stress tests, nor shall he  permit  his  patients to
                              undergo such testing at a facility owned by him, a  member of
                              his  family,  or  a  corporation  wholly,  substantially,  or
                              actually owned by him or a member of his family, and he shall
                              promptly refer all patients requiring such testing to another
                              physician.
                  
                        vi.   Dr.  Savic  shall  keep  a log (the "Prescribing Log") of all
                              prescriptions for Tremadol,  Tramacet,  Tidural  or any other
                              synthetic  narcotic ("Synthetic Narcotics") in the  form  set
                              out  at  Appendix  "A",  which  will  include  at  least  the
                              following information:
                  
                        (i)   the date of the prescription;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed;
                        (iv)  the medication dosage;
                        (v)   the quantity prescribed;
                        (vi)  the clinical indication for use and patient direction; and
                        (vii) physician initials.
                  
                        vii.  Dr. Savic  will ensure that his prescription pads are kept in
                              a secure location at all times; and
                  
                        viii. Dr. Savic shall  keep  a  copy of all prescriptions he writes
                              for all Synthetic Narcotics,  in  the  corresponding  patient
                              chart.
                  
                  
            As from November 22, 2010, the following terms, conditions and limitations  are
            imposed  on  the  certificate  of  registration  held  by  Dr.  Mile  Savic, in
            accordance  with an undertaking given by Dr. Savic to the College of Physicians
            and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Savic has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the
                  following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding
                  regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and             X
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Feb 2015
Summary:

On February 19, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Savic committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession, in that he had a conflict of interest, and that he has engaged in an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Savic 
admitted the allegations. 
 
In 2008, allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Savic were referred to the Discipline 
Committee and were withdrawn on the basis of an undertaking dated November 22, 2010. The 
terms of the undertaking, include a term requiring Dr. Savic to practice under the guidance of a 
Clinical Supervisor and a term that he abide by the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor.   
 
Dr. X acted as Dr. Savic’s Clinical Supervisor from November 22, 2010 until approximately 
April 2012. Dr. X made recommendations to Dr. Savic for practice improvements. Dr. X advised 
the College, through his reports, that Dr. Savic was not complying with his recommendations.  
Dr. Savic admits that he failed to adequately implement the recommendations of Dr. X during 
the period that Dr. X acted as Clinical Supervisor and that he engaged in disgraceful, 
dishonourable and unprofessional conduct by breaching this term of his undertaking. 
 
Since April 2012, Dr. Y became and continues to act as Dr. Savic’s Clinical Supervisor. Dr. Y 
has reported to the College that Dr. Savic has implemented his recommendations. 
 
Following receipt of patient complaints and supervision reports from Dr. X, the College 
commenced an investigation into Dr. Savic’s practice. Dr. Z provided an independent opinion to 
the College regarding Dr. Savic’s care and treatment of patients. Dr. Z concluded that Dr. Savic 
did not meet the standard of practice of the profession that would be reasonably expected of a 
competent practitioner in his field of practice. Of the 25 charts reviewed, Dr. Z found 20 charts 
were deficient in documentation, in 12 charts Dr. Z was unable to determine if the standard of 
care was met due to documentation deficiencies and 7 charts had significant care concerns. The 
standard of care was met in 5 charts and partially met in 2 charts. 
 
Since approximately April 2012, Dr. Y has been Dr. Savic’s Clinical Supervisor. In his reports to 
the College, Dr. Y has reported that Dr. Savic now meets the standard of care, including with 
respect to documentation in charts. Dr. Y has advised the College that Dr. Savic is complying 
with his recommendations. 
 
Dr. Savic admits that he placed himself in a conflict of interest in that he ordered diagnostic 
testing for some of his patients, to be performed at his clinic, and failed to disclose his 
proprietary interest. As of March 1, 2013, Dr. Savic voluntarily ceased performing diagnostic 
testing at his clinic in circumstances where he had a conflict of interest. Dr. Savic signed an 
undertaking dated November 6, 2013, in which he agreed not to refer his patients for diagnostic 
testing in a facility in which he had a proprietary interest and agreed to refer his patients to 
another physician when there is a conflict of interest.  
 
The College and Dr. Savic agreed to additional facts in respect of penalty including that, in 2007, 
the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College ordered Dr. Savic to be 
 cautioned in writing regarding the importance of performing and documenting a thorough 
 physical examination of patients. In 2008, the Chief of Hospital 1’s emergency department 
notified the College of concerns regarding Dr. Savic’s prescribing practice. Allegations of 
professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee and withdrawn on the basis 
of an undertaking signed by Dr. Savic on November 22, 2010, one of the terms of which was the 
resignation of narcotics prescribing privileges. This term, condition and limitation remains on 
Dr. Savic’s certificate of registration. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
1.  the Registrar suspend Dr. Savic’s Certificate of Registration for a two month period 
    effective immediately.  
2.  the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Savic’s 
    Certificate of Registration: 
    i.  Dr. Savic, at his own expense, is to submit to a comprehensive practice assessment of 
        his practice, by an assessor selected by the College, immediately following the 
        completion of the individualized Educational Plan, which is now in progress, and which 
        is expected to be completed by July 31, 2015; 
    ii. Dr. Savic shall abide by those recommendations made by the Assessor which are 
        determined by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee to be reasonable.  Dr. 
        Savic shall be permitted to make written submissions on his own behalf within 30 days 
        of receipt of the assessment to the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.  The 
        Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee shall receive and review the assessor’s 
        recommendations and Dr. Savic’s written submissions and make a determination 
        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if so, 
        whether they constitute terms, conditions or limitations on Dr. Savic’s practice, in 
        which case they will be included on the public register. 
   iii. Dr. Savic shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated 
        instruction in Ethics no later than one (1) year from the date of this Order; 
   iv.  Dr. Savic shall not delegate to any other person any Controlled Act as that term is 
        defined in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991; 
    v.  Dr. Savic shall not conduct or interpret Echocardiograms or exercise stress tests, nor 
        shall he permit his patients to undergo such testing at a facility owned by him, a 
        member of his family, or a corporation wholly, substantially, or actually owned by him 
        or a member of his family, and he shall promptly refer all patients requiring such testing 
        to another physician. 
   vi.  Dr. Savic shall keep a log (the “Prescribing Log”) of all prescriptions for Tremadol, 
        Tramacet, Tidural or any other synthetic narcotic (“Synthetic Narcotics”) in the form set 
        out at Appendix “A”, which will include at least the following information: 
            (i)  the date of the prescription; 
            (ii) the name of the patient with chart/file number; 
            (iii) the name of the medication prescribed; 
            (iv) the medication dosage; 
            (v)  the quantity prescribed; 
           (vi) the clinical indication for use and patient direction; and 
           (vii)  physician initials. 

  vii. Dr. Savic will ensure that his prescription pads are kept in a secure location at all times; 
       and 
 viii. Dr. Savic shall keep a copy of all prescriptions he writes for all Synthetic Narcotics, in 
       the corresponding patient chart. 

3. Dr. Savic appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
4. Dr. Savic pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00 within 60 days of the date of 
   this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 19,. 2015

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)