Savilo, Elena (CPSO#: 63233)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 07 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Sep 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2014