Savin, Evgenije Eugene (CPSO#: 64282)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Macedonian, Serbian, Slovenian, Yugoslav

Education:University of Belgrade, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2008