Savoury, Loren Wilson (CPSO#: 53404)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2005