Sawatzky, Vernon Wayne (CPSO#: 67491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vernon Sawatzky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sawatzky ( CPSO# 67491 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 19, 2016, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vernon Wayne Sawatzky in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sawatzky to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        Dr. Sawatzky's practice is restricted to the following areas:
                        Long-term care and surgical assisting.