Sawer, Benjamin Arthur (CPSO#: 24778)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 29 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008