Sawka, Annie Mary (CPSO#: 65043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 12EN-212
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3678
Fax: (416) 340-3314
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE MARY SAWKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993