Sawka, Carol Anne (CPSO#: 52865)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Ave Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017