Sawyer, Michael Bruce (CPSO#: 68161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
Cross Cancer Institute
11560 University Avenue NW
Edmonton AB  T6G 1Z2
Phone: (780) 432-8248
Fax: (780) 432-8888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRUCE SAWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWYER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998