Sawyer, Sarah Lynn (CPSO#: 96970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3804
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH LYNN SAWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWYER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013