Sax, Solly Erwin (CPSO#: 31071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Sol E. Sax Medicine
Professional Corporation
2 Edgemore Dr.
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 2M7
Phone: (416) 234-2060
Fax: (416) 850-5687
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sol E. Sax Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sax ( CPSO# 31071 )

Business Address:
2 Edgemore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 2M7
Phone Number: (416) 627-6043

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOLLY ERWIN SAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1979