Saxena, Rahul (CPSO#: 69840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Roundhouse Pediatrics
3093 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 1Z9
Phone: (416) 769-5437
Fax: (647) 689-3093
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saxena ( CPSO# 69840 )

Business Address:
3093 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 1Z9
Phone Number: (416) 769-5437

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHUL SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 May 1996 to 29 May 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2001