Saxena, Rajesh (CPSO#: 70756)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Delhi, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 1997