Saxon, Benjamin Richard (CPSO#: 69550)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2009