Sayal, Manoj Kumar (CPSO#: 62696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 618-0098
Fax: (905) 618-0100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. K. Sayal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sayal ( CPSO# 62696 )

Business Address:
Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 618-0098

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANOJ KUMAR SAYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992