Sayani, Eshratbanu (CPSO#: 32187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
10 Mallard Road
North York ON  M3B 3N1
Phone: (647) 391 5955
Fax: (647) 391 5958
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

265 Yorkland Blvd # 403
North York ON  M2J5C7
Canada
Phone: 4162292399
Fax: 4162299771
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Sayani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sayani ( CPSO# 32187 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
265 Yorkland Boulevard
North York ON  M2J 5C7

Business Address:
310 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (647) 350-0550

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 310 1920 Ellesmere Road Scarborough ON M1H 2V6 Tel: 647-350-0550 Fax: 647-350-0552
Date Received: 03 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESHRATBANU SAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1981