Sayed, Mohammed Sobhi Hassan (CPSO#: 83829)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 24 Jan 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006