Sayed Qasem, Fatma S S S M (CPSO#: 75568)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 05 Apr 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2002