Sayedi Roshkhar, Sayedhadi (CPSO#: 89520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5800
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke general hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 4164942120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East, Brampton
Toronto ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital, Birchmoun
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital - General
3050 Lawrence ave East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sayedi Roshkhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sayedi Roshkhar ( CPSO# 89520 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Street
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAYEDHADI SAYEDI ROSHKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYEDI ROSHKHAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014