Sayes, Najla Mohammed Omar (CPSO#: 79271)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 07 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 10 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010