Sazant, Marvin (CPSO#: 18288)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 17 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 547 Douglas Avenue Toronto, ON M5M 1H7
Instructions: Please request records in writing
Date Received: 05 Dec 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2006
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 17 Jan 2011

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Feb 2009
Summary:

On February 20, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sazant was guilty of misconduct 
in a professional respect under s. 34(3)(c) of The Medical Act, R.S.O. 1970, c. 268; and has 
committed professional misconduct, by sexual impropriety with a patient, under para. 26.28 of 
O.Reg. 577/75 under the Health Disciplines Act, and by conduct or an act relevant to the practice 
of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional under para. 26.31 of O.Reg. 577/75, 
para. 27.32 of O.Reg. 448/80, and para. 29.33 of O.Reg. 548/90, under the Health Disciplines 
Act. 
 
Dr. Sazant engaged in acts of professional misconduct with three boys. Regarding one individual, 
Dr. Sazant engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct, including tying him 
up when he was 12 years old, hitting him with a belt, having the boy tie him to a bed, sexual 
touching, and providing him with alcohol. Regarding the second individual, who was a patient, 
Dr. Sazant engaged in misconduct in a professional respect, acts of sexual impropriety, and 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including kissing and hugging him, tying 
him to a bed, sexual touching and activity. With regard to the third individual, Dr. Sazant 
engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct, including kissing him, tying 
him to the bed, oral sex and sexual touching. 
 
On September 2, 2009, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      1.    The Registrar revoke Dr. Sazant's certificate of registration effective immediately. 
      2.    Dr. Sazant pay costs to the College in the amount of $95,812, within 90 days of 
            the date of the order.  
      3.    The results of the proceeding be included in the register. 
 
On September 21, 2009, Dr. Sazant appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the 
Divisional Court.  In the circumstances, the decision of the Discipline Committee remained in 
effect despite the appeal. 
 
On October 15, 2009, the Divisional Court ordered that Dr. Sazant's revocation be stayed and 
that he be permitted to practise under the following terms, conditions and limitations pending the 
appeal: 
 
      1.    Dr. Sazant not have any professional encounters with patients under the age of 16 
            years old. 
      2.    Dr. Sazant consents to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario having 
            access to his OHIP billings. 
      3.    Dr. Sazant shall not interfere with unannounced inspections of his office(s), 
            practice(s), and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of 
            monitoring compliance and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
 
On January 17, 2011, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Sazant's appeal and upheld the decision 
of the Discipline Committee. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect. 
 
On February 1, 2011, Dr. Sazant filed a Notice of Motion for Leave to Appeal the decision of the 
Divisional Court to the Court of Appeal. 
 
On March 11, 2011, the Court of Appeal denied Dr. Sazant's motion for a stay of the revocation 
of his certificate of registration pending his motion for leave to appeal, and, if leave is granted, 
pending the appeal.  Therefore, the revocation of Dr. Sazant's certificate of registration remains 
in effect. 
 
On June 3, 2011, the Court of Appeal granted Dr. Sazant's Motion for Leave to Appeal the 
decision of the Divisional Court. On June 9, 2011, Dr. Sazant filed a Notice of Appeal to the 
Court of Appeal based on the Court of Appeal's endorsement dated June 3, 2011, granting leave 
to appeal. The revocation of Dr. Sazant's certificate of registration remains in effect. 
 
On October 30, 2012, the Court of Appeal dismissed Dr. Sazant's appeal.  
 
On December 27, 2012, Dr. Sazant applied for leave to appeal to the Supreme Court of Canada 
from the judgment of the Court of Appeal made October 30, 2012. 
 
On April 25, 2013, the Supreme Court of Canada dismissed with costs Dr. Sazant's application 
for leave to appeal the Ontario Court of Appeal decision. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 17 Jan 2011
Hearing Date(s): Apr 23, 2007