Sbayi, Samer (CPSO#: 105371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jan 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Techologica De Santiago, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Jan 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1  of  2)  As  from  November  13,  2017,  the following is imposed as a term,
            condition and limitation on the certificate of  registration  held by Dr. Samer
            Sbayi, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.  Sbayi to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                                ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                       of

                                                DR. SAMER SBAYI
                                                ("Dr. Sbayi")
                  
                                                       to
                  
                              COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is  Schedule 2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions  Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sbayi, certificate of registration  number  105371, am a member of
                  the  College.  The  College  has  inquired  into my compliance  with  the
                  requirement  to  participate  in  a  program  of continuing  professional
                  development.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Sbayi, am currently not practising medicine  in  Ontario  and I am
                  entering  into  this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with  the
                  Continuing Professional  Development  requirement  under  section  29  of
                  Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I,  Dr. Sbayi, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise
                  medicine  in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions
                  have been met:

                  (a)   I provide  a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the  College  with  proof  that  I  am participating in a
                        program  of  continuing  professional development  that  meets  the
                        requirements for continuing  professional  development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that  has been approved by
                        the  College  for  that  purpose  that  meets the requirements  for
                        continuing professional development set by  the  Royal  College  of
                        Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  or  the  College  of  Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (5)   I,  Dr.  Sbayi,  undertake  that  upon  signing  this Undertaking I shall
                  forward  a  request to the General Manager of the OHIP  that  my  billing
                  number be deactivated  for  services  rendered  after the date I cease to
                  practise  and before the date the College agrees that  I  may  return  to
                  practise in accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Sbayi,  undertake  to  abide  by  the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who  Cease  to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due  to  Relocation,  a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (7)   I,  Dr. Sbayi, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr.  Sbayi,  acknowledge  that  in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the College may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified  terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request  that  I  enter  into  an  appropriate   assessment  and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (9)   I,  Dr.  Sbayi, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely  responsible
                  for payment  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Sbayi,  undertake  to comply with the provisions and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge  that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an  act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral  of  specified  allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Sbayi, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have  waived  my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Sbayi, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions,  and  limitations  on  my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.  I  understand  that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is  available  to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I,  Dr. Sbayi, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on  the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr.  Sbayi  has  voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario
                        and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice
                        or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I,  Dr.  Sbayi,  give my irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to  make
                  appropriate enquiries  of  OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information,  in  order  for  the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I,  Dr. Sbayi, acknowledge that I have executed the  OHIP  consent  form,
                  attached  hereto  as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (2 of 2) The certificate  of  registration held by Dr. Samer Sbayi also carries
            the  following  term, condition and  limitation  imposed  by  the  Registration
            Committee, effective Nov 25 2016.

            Dr. Samer Sbayi may  practise medicine independently in general surgery limited
            to abdominal wall hernias. 

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Samer Sbayi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 13, 2017:

Dr. Sbayi has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.