Sbrocchi, Anne Marie (CPSO#: 87670)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2007 to 29 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011