Sbrocchi, Stephanie Clare (CPSO#: 74958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 523-9199
Fax: (705) 523-9197
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Sbrocchi and Dr. Andre Michon Medici

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2009


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Sbrocchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sbrocchi ( CPSO# 74958 )

Business Address:
Unit 9
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 523-9199

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
935 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone Number: (705) 675-4883

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CLARE SBROCCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SBROCCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002