Scanlan, Daniel Todd (CPSO#: 70118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
309 Midland Avenue
Midland ON  L4R 3K5
Phone: (705) 527-7744
Fax: (705) 527-6731
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scanlan and Jones Medicine Professional Corporation / Scanlan et Jones Medecine Societe Professionelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones ( CPSO# 70435 )
Dr. D. Scanlan ( CPSO# 70118 )

Business Address:
309 Midland Avenue
Midland ON  L4R 3K5
Phone Number: (705) 527-7744

Business Address:
371 Yonge Street
Midland ON  L4R 3A7
Phone Number: (705) 245-3330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL TODD SCANLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCANLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001