Scappatura, Sharon Ann (CPSO#: 64153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ANN SCAPPATURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCAPPATURA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1992