Scaranelo, Anabel Medeiros (CPSO#: 85761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Estadual de Londrina, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Room 3-922
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4833
Fax: (416) 946-6564
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Marvelle Koffler Breast Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416 586-4800 Ext. 8751
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Scaranelo & Santos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011


Corporation Name: Scaranelo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Scaranelo ( CPSO# 85761 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
610 University Avenue
Room 3-922
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 945-4601

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Dec 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2007 to 10 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2007 to 14 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jun 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Anabel Medeiros Scaranelo may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.