Scarfone, David John (CPSO#: 51667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1985


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2224 Walker Road
Suite 140
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 258-8802
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Scarfone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Dr. D. Scarfone ( CPSO# 51667 )

Business Address:
Suite 140
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 258-8802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Aug 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN SCARFONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCARFONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1985