Schabas, Richard Elliot (CPSO#: 29254)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 24 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 213-360 Bloor Street East Toronto ON M4W 3M3
Date Received: 24 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2017