Schabauer, Kristina Elizabeth (CPSO#: 104159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 CF Health Services
Centre Winnipeg
P O BOX 17000 Station Forces
Building 62 715 Wihuri Road
Winnipeg MB  R3J 3Y5
Phone: 204-833-2500 Ext. 5595
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
102-480 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-0933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINA ELIZABETH SCHABAUER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHABAUER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016