Schachter, Joyce (CPSO#: 68284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 728-5863
Fax: (613) 728-4745
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Urogynecology and Reconstructive
Pelvic Surgery - 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81722
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Jul 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE SCHACHTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHACHTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1999