Schachter, Michael Eli (CPSO#: 81585)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2006 to 29 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2012 to 30 May 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2012