Schacter, Gordon Barry (CPSO#: 66426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone: (519) 673-3900
Fax: (519) 673-5627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schacter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Schacter ( CPSO# 66426 )

Business Address:
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
Suite 1
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone Number: (519) 673-3900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON BARRY SCHACTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHACTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995